NY S00306 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-05 - PRINT NUMBER 306A
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-05 - PRINT NUMBER 306A
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases promoting prostitution in the fourth degree from a class A misdemeanor to a class E felony; includes within such offense the knowing issuance, provision, mailing, distribution or transmission of any written material or electronic communication which advertises the provision of sexual conduct in return for a fee.
Title
Increases promoting prostitution in the fourth degree from a class A misdemeanor to a class E felony; includes within such offense the knowing issuance, provision, mailing, distribution or transmission of any written material or electronic communication which advertises the provision of sexual conduct in return for a fee.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 306A |
2012-01-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2011-03-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2011-02-22 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A04885 (Same As) 2012-01-11 - print number 4885a