NY S00288 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-23 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-23 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "American made flag act" to require that American flags purchased for use by the state government be made in the United States.
Title
Enacts the "American made flag act" to require that American flags purchased for use by the state government be made in the United States.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2016-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.802 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 288A |
2016-03-30 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2015-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.887 |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A04856 (Same As) 2016-04-01 - print number 4856a