NY A04856 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-01 - print number 4856a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-01 - print number 4856a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "American made flag act" to require that American flags purchased for use by the state government be made in the United States.
Title
Enacts the "American made flag act" to require that American flags purchased for use by the state government be made in the United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Assembly | print number 4856a |
2016-04-01 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2015-02-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S00288 (Same As) 2016-05-23 - referred to governmental operations