NY S00239 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - ordered to third reading rules cal.306
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "New York open water data act"; directs certain agencies, under the leadership of conveners, to identify and integrate key water data sets; provides duties and an annual plan for data to be researched and reported.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "New York open water data act"; directs certain agencies, under the leadership of conveners, to identify and integrate key water data sets; provides duties and an annual plan for data to be researched and reported.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-03Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.306
2024-06-03Assemblysubstituted for a3299e
2024-05-13Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2024-05-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-05-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-05-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-05-07Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-05-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.903
2024-04-08SenatePRINT NUMBER 239E
2024-04-08SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2024-01-16SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2024-01-08SenatePRINT NUMBER 239D
2024-01-08SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-06-06Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2023-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-06SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1615
2023-06-06SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-05-22SenatePRINT NUMBER 239C
2023-05-22SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2023-05-22SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2023-05-16SenatePRINT NUMBER 239B
2023-05-16SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2023-04-13SenatePRINT NUMBER 239A
2023-04-13SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2023-01-04SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

Same As/Similar To

A03299 (Same As) 2024-06-03 - substituted by s239e

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S239
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00239&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00239
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00239&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00239A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00239&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00239B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00239&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00239C
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00239&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00239D
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00239&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00239E
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S239#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S239#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S239#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S239#SC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S239#SC4
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S239#SF2

Bill Comments

feedback