NY S00181 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands who may visit local correctional facilities to include accompanying staff of legislative members and members of the department of corrections and community supervision requested by a legislative member.
Title
Expands who may visit local correctional facilities to include accompanying staff of legislative members and members of the department of corrections and community supervision requested by a legislative member.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.363 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-02-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.260 |
2023-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A06487 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to correction