NY S00178 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.242
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.242
Summary
Relates to designating the seal of the county of Cortland for use by the county clerk and the supreme court and county court of such county to execute official documents.
Title
Relates to designating the seal of the county of Cortland for use by the county clerk and the supreme court and county court of such county to execute official documents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-28 | SIGNED CHAP.242 | |
2009-07-17 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | |
2009-06-10 | returned to senate | |
2009-06-10 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-10 | ordered to third reading rules cal.106 | |
2009-06-10 | substituted for a1674 | |
2009-03-11 | referred to judiciary | |
2009-03-11 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-03-11 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-03-05 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-03-04 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-03-03 | 1ST REPORT CAL.85 | |
2009-02-10 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES | |
2009-01-07 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A01674 (Same As) 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.242
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00178&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |