NY S00163 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a penalty of not less than $1,000 for each intentional destruction, mutilation or significant alteration of a medical record by a party to a medical malpractice action, or by any officer, director, member, employee or agent of such party; also establishes a cause of action on behalf of any person injured as the result of such destruction, mutilation or significant alteration; requires disclosure of metadata, audit trail, and log-in information associated with electronic medical records in certain actions.
Title
Establishes a penalty of not less than $1,000 for each intentional destruction, mutilation or significant alteration of a medical record by a party to a medical malpractice action, or by any officer, director, member, employee or agent of such party; also establishes a cause of action on behalf of any person injured as the result of such destruction, mutilation or significant alteration; requires disclosure of metadata, audit trail, and log-in information associated with electronic medical records in certain actions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-05-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 163B |
2021-05-06 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2021-02-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 163A |
2021-02-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |