NY S00142 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-09 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-09 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts the performance of surgical devocalization procedures on dogs and cats.
Title
Restricts the performance of surgical devocalization procedures on dogs and cats.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Gianaris [D] | Sen. Patricia Canzoneri-Fitzpatrick [R] | Sen. Iwen Chu [D] | Sen. Dean Murray [R] |
Sen. Anthony Palumbo [R] | Sen. Jessica Scarcella-Spanton [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2024-04-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-04-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.744 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2023-05-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.673 |
2023-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A03569 (Same As) 2024-07-15 - enacting clause stricken