NY S00134 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - referred to banks
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - referred to banks
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing limitations on bank accounts after such accounts have been closed including opening or re-opening such account, requesting a deposit or withdrawal or assessing certain fees.
Title
Relates to establishing limitations on bank accounts after such accounts have been closed including opening or re-opening such account, requesting a deposit or withdrawal or assessing certain fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2022-03-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.211 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2021-04-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.185 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A00240 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to banks