NY S00113 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that stalking by technological means, including illegal wiretapping, cell phones, caller ID, Internet, cameras and GPS systems, shall be prohibited and shall be included in the crimes of stalking in the first, second and third degrees.
Title
Provides that stalking by technological means, including illegal wiretapping, cell phones, caller ID, Internet, cameras and GPS systems, shall be prohibited and shall be included in the crimes of stalking in the first, second and third degrees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2016-04-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-04-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.450 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1291 |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A03520 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to codes