NY S00090 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - PRINT NUMBER 90A
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - PRINT NUMBER 90A
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to promoting animal fighting and appropriately punishing individuals associated with such activities.
Title
Relates to promoting animal fighting and appropriately punishing individuals associated with such activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 90A |
2022-03-21 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2021-03-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-01-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.176 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A00696 (Same As) 2022-04-28 - advanced to third reading cal.519