NY S00055 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-07 - signed chap.55
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-07 - signed chap.55
Summary
Makes appropriations for the support of government - Transportation, Economic Development and Environmental Conservation Budget.
Title
Makes appropriations for the support of government - Transportation, Economic Development and Environmental Conservation Budget.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-31 | SUBSTITUTED BY A155C | |
2009-03-31 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.134 | |
2009-03-31 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-03-28 | PRINT NUMBER 55C | |
2009-03-28 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | |
2009-03-28 | PRINT NUMBER 55B | |
2009-03-28 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | |
2009-01-27 | PRINT NUMBER 55A | |
2009-01-27 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | |
2009-01-07 | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A00155 (Same As) 2009-04-07 - signed chap.55
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00055&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |