NY S00029 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to process server records; provides for oversight of process server records by third party contractors.
Title
Relates to process server records; provides for oversight of process server records by third party contractors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2018-02-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.412 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2017-03-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.246 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A03939 (Same As) 2018-05-30 - reported referred to codes