NY A03939 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to process server records; provides for oversight of process server records by third party contractors.
Title
Relates to process server records; provides for oversight of process server records by third party contractors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S00029 (Same As) 2018-02-27 - referred to economic development