NY S00017 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-16 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-16 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that vacancies in the office of regent shall be filled by appointment.
Title
Provides that vacancies in the office of regent shall be filled by appointment.
Sponsors
Sen. Kenneth LaValle [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] |
Sen. Jack Martins [R] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Assembly | referred to education |
2016-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1413 |
2016-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-02-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 17B |
2016-02-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2015-01-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 17A |
2015-01-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |