NY J02586 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - ADOPTED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - ADOPTED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring influential Black authors upon the occasion of special recognition at the Black Authors Festival in Sag Harbor, New York on August 3, 2024
Title
Honoring influential Black authors upon the occasion of special recognition at the Black Authors Festival in Sag Harbor, New York on August 3, 2024
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-29 | Senate | ADOPTED |
2024-05-29 | Senate | REPORTED TO CALENDAR FOR CONSIDERATION |
2024-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
K02287 (Same As) 2024-05-28 - adopted