NY A11100 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-30 - signed chap.446
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-30 - signed chap.446
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to service of orders of protection including applications to extend and petitions for violations of orders of protection and temporary orders of protection in family court.
Title
Relates to service of orders of protection including applications to extend and petitions for violations of orders of protection and temporary orders of protection in family court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-30 | signed chap.446 | |
2010-08-18 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-24 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-24 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-24 | 3RD READING CAL.1156 | |
2010-06-24 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8058 | |
2010-06-15 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2010-06-15 | delivered to senate | |
2010-06-15 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-15 | ordered to third reading rules cal.162 | |
2010-06-15 | rules report cal.162 | |
2010-06-15 | reported | |
2010-06-08 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-05-25 | reported referred to codes | |
2010-05-14 | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S08058 (Same As) 2010-06-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11100