NY A11093 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - ordered to third reading rules cal.288
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - ordered to third reading rules cal.288
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the birds and bees protection act; prohibits the sale of certain pesticides and requires the commissioner of environmental conservation to report on the use of certain pesticides; requires the department of environmental conservation to consider a strategy for the development of pollinator friendly lands; requires the department of environmental conservation to distribute information to protect migratory birds; and requires the department of environmental conservation to make recommendations to the department of transportation on the species of plantings and the application of pesticides.
Title
Enacts the birds and bees protection act; prohibits the sale of certain pesticides and requires the commissioner of environmental conservation to report on the use of certain pesticides; requires the department of environmental conservation to consider a strategy for the development of pollinator friendly lands; requires the department of environmental conservation to distribute information to protect migratory birds; and requires the department of environmental conservation to make recommendations to the department of transportation on the species of plantings and the application of pesticides.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Englebright [D] | Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] | Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.288 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.288 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | print number 11093a |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |