NY A11051 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - signed chap.369
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - signed chap.369
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that any income included pursuant to section 512(a)(7) of the internal revenue code shall be subtracted from federal unrelated business taxable income.
Title
Establishes that any income included pursuant to section 512(a)(7) of the internal revenue code shall be subtracted from federal unrelated business taxable income.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Michaelle Solages [D] | Asm. Robert Carroll [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-07 | Senate | signed chap.369 |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1887 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8831 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.238 |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.238 |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S08831 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11051