NY A10979 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-17 - signed chap.506
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends until December 1, 2012 the authorization of the county of Wyoming to impose a recording tax on obligations secured by a mortgage on real property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends until December 1, 2012 the authorization of the county of Wyoming to impose a recording tax on obligations secured by a mortgage on real property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 52 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-09-17 signed chap.506
2010-09-07 delivered to governor
2010-06-24 RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2010-06-24 PASSED SENATE
2010-06-24 HOME RULE REQUEST
2010-06-24 3RD READING CAL.1183
2010-06-24 SUBSTITUTED FOR S7736
2010-06-22 REFERRED TO RULES
2010-06-22 delivered to senate
2010-06-22 passed assembly
2010-06-22 home rule request
2010-06-16 ordered to third reading rules cal.199
2010-06-16 rules report cal.199
2010-06-16 reported
2010-06-15 reported referred to rules
2010-05-05 referred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S07736 (Same As) 2010-06-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10979

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback