NY S07736 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10979
Status: Introduced on May 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10979
Summary
Extends until December 1, 2012 the authorization of the county of Wyoming to impose a recording tax on obligations secured by a mortgage on real property.
Title
Extends until December 1, 2012 the authorization of the county of Wyoming to impose a recording tax on obligations secured by a mortgage on real property.
Sponsors
Sen. Dale Volker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-24 | SUBSTITUTED BY A10979 | |
2010-06-24 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1183 | |
2010-06-15 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2010-06-03 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2010-05-05 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10979 (Same As) 2010-09-17 - signed chap.506
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07736&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |