NY A10810 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes in the city of Buffalo a demonstration program implementing speed violation monitoring systems in school speed zones by means of photo devices.
Title
Establishes in the city of Buffalo a demonstration program implementing speed violation monitoring systems in school speed zones by means of photo devices.
Sponsors
Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] | Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] |
Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 99 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | home rule request |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.287 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.287 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-05-18 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S08746 (Same As) 2018-05-21 - PRINT NUMBER 8746A