NY A10665 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7682
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7682
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the sheriff of Albany county to enter into agreements for custody of inmates from other states.
Title
Authorizes the sheriff of Albany county to enter into agreements for custody of inmates from other states.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Assembly | substituted by s7682 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.554 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S07682 (Same As) 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.433