NY S07682 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.433
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the sheriff of Albany county to enter into agreements for custody of inmates from other states.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the sheriff of Albany county to enter into agreements for custody of inmates from other states.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17AssemblySIGNED CHAP.433
2012-08-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-21Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-21Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-21Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.554
2012-06-21Assemblysubstituted for a10665
2012-06-20Assemblyreferred to codes
2012-06-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-20SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1421
2012-06-20SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2012-06-13SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A10665 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7682

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback