NY A10640 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-06 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-06 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes municipalities to adopt a local law, ordinance or resolution providing for a sales tax exemption for clothing and footwear after March 1, 2022 and no later than August 1, 2022; provides for the repeal of such provisions on January 1, 2023.
Title
Authorizes municipalities to adopt a local law, ordinance or resolution providing for a sales tax exemption for clothing and footwear after March 1, 2022 and no later than August 1, 2022; provides for the repeal of such provisions on January 1, 2023.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S09328 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - referred to ways and means