NY S09328 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-31 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-31 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes municipalities to adopt a local law, ordinance or resolution providing for a sales tax exemption for clothing and footwear after March 1, 2022 and no later than August 1, 2022; provides for the repeal of such provisions on January 1, 2023.
Title
Authorizes municipalities to adopt a local law, ordinance or resolution providing for a sales tax exemption for clothing and footwear after March 1, 2022 and no later than August 1, 2022; provides for the repeal of such provisions on January 1, 2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1599 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10640 (Same As) 2022-07-06 - referred to ways and means