NY A10587 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - substituted by s7927
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - substituted by s7927
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the use of certain property in the county of Suffolk.
Title
Provides for the use of certain property in the county of Suffolk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s7927 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.531 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | print number 10587a |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07927 (Same As) 2016-09-30 - SIGNED CHAP.395