NY S07927 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - SIGNED CHAP.395
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - SIGNED CHAP.395
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the use of certain property in the county of Suffolk.
Title
Provides for the use of certain property in the county of Suffolk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.395 |
2016-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.531 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a10587a |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1796 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10587 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - substituted by s7927