NY A10584 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a tax credit for donation of wholesome food to a food bank or other emergency food program by eligible New York state farmers.
Title
Establishes a tax credit for donation of wholesome food to a food bank or other emergency food program by eligible New York state farmers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | tabled |
2016-11-28 | Senate | vetoed memo.260 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1945 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7833 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.507 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.507 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07833 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10584