NY A10565 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a finding of educational neglect based solely on excessive absence from school in certain situations during the COVID-19 state of emergency.
Title
Prohibits a finding of educational neglect based solely on excessive absence from school in certain situations during the COVID-19 state of emergency.
Sponsors
Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | print number 10565a |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to children and families |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S08398 (Same As) 2020-05-21 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES