NY A10541 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7477
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7477
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Tabernacle of Praise Church to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Title
Authorizes Tabernacle of Praise Church to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Sponsors
Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Assembly | substituted by s7477 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.551 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2012-06-04 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07477 (Same As) 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.251