NY S07477 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.251
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.251
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Tabernacle of Praise Church to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Title
Authorizes Tabernacle of Praise Church to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.251 |
2012-07-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.551 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a10541 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2012-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1370 |
2012-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10541 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7477