NY A10527 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - substituted by s6708a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - substituted by s6708a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the mandatory rededication of unused funds in the New York state local government records management improvement fund to such fund.
Title
Relates to the mandatory rededication of unused funds in the New York state local government records management improvement fund to such fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted by s6708a |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.463 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06708 (Same As) 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.280