NY S06708 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.280
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.280
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the mandatory rededication of unused funds in the New York state local government records management improvement fund to such fund.
Title
Relates to the mandatory rededication of unused funds in the New York state local government records management improvement fund to such fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.280 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.463 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a10527 |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 6708A |
2016-05-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.917 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A10527 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - substituted by s6708a