NY A10470 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of health to conduct a study of the delivery of ambulatory care on Staten Island.
Title
Directs the commissioner of health to conduct a study of the delivery of ambulatory care on Staten Island.
Sponsors
Asm. Charles Fall [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Taylor Darling [D] | Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D] |
Asm. Latrice Walker [D] | Asm. Inez Dickens [D] | Asm. Michael Cusick [D] | Asm. Alfred Taylor [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Senate | tabled |
2020-11-27 | Senate | vetoed memo.64 |
2020-11-18 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1000 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8719 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.271 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.271 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | print number 10470a |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2020-05-22 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08719 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - tabled