NY A10433 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - signed chap.157
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - signed chap.157
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to adding Black Creek located in Monroe county to the definition of inland waterways.
Title
Relates to adding Black Creek located in Monroe county to the definition of inland waterways.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Senate | signed chap.157 |
2016-07-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1835 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7984 |
2016-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.149 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.149 |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07984 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10433