NY A10422 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing an accidental disability retirement pension for deputy sheriffs employed by Nassau county; provides that a deputy sheriff employed by Nassau county shall receive a pension of three-quarters of his or her final average salary.
Title
Relates to establishing an accidental disability retirement pension for deputy sheriffs employed by Nassau county; provides that a deputy sheriff employed by Nassau county shall receive a pension of three-quarters of his or her final average salary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | home rule request |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.755 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.755 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S09368 (Same As) 2022-05-20 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS