NY A10411 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - substituted by s9785
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - substituted by s9785
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to assessments for certain real property tax exemptions to include years where there is sufficient data to determine an applicant's eligibility for exemptions.
Title
Relates to assessments for certain real property tax exemptions to include years where there is sufficient data to determine an applicant's eligibility for exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Assembly | substituted by s9785 |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.472 |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | reported |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2024-05-24 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S09785 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - returned to senate