NY A10407 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - ordered to third reading rules cal.215
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - ordered to third reading rules cal.215
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to mandatory training curriculum for election commissioners and key staff of boards of elections and to model poll worker training programs; entitles state agency employees to leave for election administration and training; requires the state board of elections to develop and provide to each county materials for a model poll worker training program which the counties may use to train individuals to serve as poll workers in state and county elections.
Title
Relates to mandatory training curriculum for election commissioners and key staff of boards of elections and to model poll worker training programs; entitles state agency employees to leave for election administration and training; requires the state board of elections to develop and provide to each county materials for a model poll worker training program which the counties may use to train individuals to serve as poll workers in state and county elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.215 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.215 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | referred to election law |