NY A10391 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s7674
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s7674
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the Camillus Volunteer Fire Department, Inc. from the requirement that the percentage of non-resident fire department members not exceed forty-five percent of the membership.
Title
Exempts the Camillus Volunteer Fire Department, Inc. from the requirement that the percentage of non-resident fire department members not exceed forty-five percent of the membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s7674 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.751 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-13 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07674 (Same As) 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.327