NY A10387 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9177b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9177b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the 13 member New York Asian American and Pacific Islander commission to develop policies to improve the community, economic and social well-being, and the health and educational needs important to Asian American and Pacific Islander communities in the state; to develop and coordinate statewide programs, recognizing the continuing contributions of Asian American and Pacific Islander individuals in the state; to create and implement public education campaigns regarding Asian American and Pacific Islander issues and culture; to increase the awareness among Asian American and Pacific Islander individuals of state and local resources that may benefit Asian American and Pacific Islander individuals and communities as a whole; and to undertake any other activities the commission deems necessary and applicable to support Asian American and Pacific Islander communities in the state.
Title
Establishes the 13 member New York Asian American and Pacific Islander commission to develop policies to improve the community, economic and social well-being, and the health and educational needs important to Asian American and Pacific Islander communities in the state; to develop and coordinate statewide programs, recognizing the continuing contributions of Asian American and Pacific Islander individuals in the state; to create and implement public education campaigns regarding Asian American and Pacific Islander issues and culture; to increase the awareness among Asian American and Pacific Islander individuals of state and local resources that may benefit Asian American and Pacific Islander individuals and communities as a whole; and to undertake any other activities the commission deems necessary and applicable to support Asian American and Pacific Islander communities in the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s9177b |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.642 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.642 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | print number 10387a |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2022-05-13 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S09177 (Same As) 2022-11-23 - VETOED MEMO.84