NY S09177 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - VETOED MEMO.84
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - VETOED MEMO.84
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the 13 member New York Asian American and Pacific Islander commission to develop policies to improve the community, economic and social well-being, and the health and educational needs important to Asian American and Pacific Islander communities in the state; to develop and coordinate statewide programs, recognizing the continuing contributions of Asian American and Pacific Islander individuals in the state; to create and implement public education campaigns regarding Asian American and Pacific Islander issues and culture; to increase the awareness among Asian American and Pacific Islander individuals of state and local resources that may benefit Asian American and Pacific Islander individuals and communities as a whole; and to undertake any other activities the commission deems necessary and applicable to support Asian American and Pacific Islander communities in the state.
Title
Establishes the 13 member New York Asian American and Pacific Islander commission to develop policies to improve the community, economic and social well-being, and the health and educational needs important to Asian American and Pacific Islander communities in the state; to develop and coordinate statewide programs, recognizing the continuing contributions of Asian American and Pacific Islander individuals in the state; to create and implement public education campaigns regarding Asian American and Pacific Islander issues and culture; to increase the awareness among Asian American and Pacific Islander individuals of state and local resources that may benefit Asian American and Pacific Islander individuals and communities as a whole; and to undertake any other activities the commission deems necessary and applicable to support Asian American and Pacific Islander communities in the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-23 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.84 |
2022-11-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.642 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a10387a |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1712 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 9177B |
2022-05-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2022-05-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 9177A |
2022-05-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2022-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10387 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9177b