NY A10358 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-15 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-15 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires employers to provide a written notice of the right to file for unemployment benefits to any employee who has not been scheduled or offered work hours in the past seven days or offered work for the next seven day period.
Title
Requires employers to provide a written notice of the right to file for unemployment benefits to any employee who has not been scheduled or offered work hours in the past seven days or offered work for the next seven day period.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | print number 10358a |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2020-04-29 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S08234 (Same As) 2020-04-27 - REFERRED TO LABOR