NY A10345 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - substituted by s9698
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - substituted by s9698
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the New York state housing finance agency bonding authority to $34,380,000,000.
Title
Increases the New York state housing finance agency bonding authority to $34,380,000,000.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Assembly | substituted by s9698 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.380 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.380 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-05-17 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S09698 (Same As) 2024-06-04 - ordered to third reading rules cal.380