NY A10296 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - signed chap.156
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - signed chap.156
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the definition of "restricted period" for purposes of disclosure of state contracts.
Title
Clarifies the definition of "restricted period" for purposes of disclosure of state contracts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Senate | signed chap.156 |
2016-07-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1744 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7722 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.207 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.207 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-20 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07722 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10296