NY A10293 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-15 - substituted by s7422
Status: Introduced on March 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-15 - substituted by s7422
Summary
Relates to redistributing 2009 bond volume allocations, allocating the unified state bond volume ceiling, and enacting the private activity bond act of 2010.
Title
Relates to redistributing 2009 bond volume allocations, allocating the unified state bond volume ceiling, and enacting the private activity bond act of 2010.
Sponsors
Asm. Sam Hoyt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-15 | substituted by s7422 | |
2010-06-15 | rules report cal.150 | |
2010-06-15 | reported | |
2010-06-15 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-04-13 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-03-16 | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S7422 (Same As) 2010-07-15 - SIGNED CHAP.214
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10293&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |