NY A10283 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies that a musician or other performing artist who is exempt from the requirement to have workers' compensation insurance because he or she is an executive officer of a corporation who is deemed excluded from coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifies that a musician or other performing artist who is exempt from the requirement to have workers' compensation insurance because he or she is an executive officer of a corporation who is deemed excluded from coverage.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-12-31Senatetabled
2016-12-31Senatevetoed memo.300
2016-12-20Assemblydelivered to governor
2016-06-17SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2016-06-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2016-06-17Senate3RD READING CAL.1197
2016-06-17SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7709
2016-06-16SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2016-06-16Assemblydelivered to senate
2016-06-16Assemblypassed assembly
2016-06-15Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.416
2016-06-15Assemblyrules report cal.416
2016-06-15Assemblyreported
2016-06-01Assemblyreported referred to rules
2016-05-24Assemblyprint number 10283a
2016-05-24Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to labor
2016-05-20Assemblyreferred to labor

Same As/Similar To

S07709 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10283A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback