NY S07709 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10283A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10283A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that a musician or other performing artist who is exempt from the requirement to have workers' compensation insurance because he or she is an executive officer of a corporation who is deemed excluded from coverage.
Title
Clarifies that a musician or other performing artist who is exempt from the requirement to have workers' compensation insurance because he or she is an executive officer of a corporation who is deemed excluded from coverage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10283A |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1197 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A10283 (Same As) 2016-12-31 - tabled