NY A10276 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the sale or use of nitrogen fertilizer; prohibits the sale or use of fertilizer in Nassau or Suffolk counties other than low nitrogen fertilizer; requires the department of environmental conservation to report to the governor and legislature regarding expanding the prohibition to other areas of the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the sale or use of nitrogen fertilizer; prohibits the sale or use of fertilizer in Nassau or Suffolk counties other than low nitrogen fertilizer; requires the department of environmental conservation to report to the governor and legislature regarding expanding the prohibition to other areas of the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 105 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2018-04-24Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-04-24Assemblypassed assembly
2018-04-19Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.774
2018-04-17Assemblyreported
2018-04-17Assemblyreported referred to codes
2018-04-10Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S08170 (Same As) 2018-04-13 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback