NY A10272 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-15 - substituted by s7129b
Status: Introduced on March 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-15 - substituted by s7129b
Summary
This legislation will authorize the Greenburgh North Castle Union Free School District to continue leasing property outside of district bounda- ries for the purpose of providing instruction to students. Section 1: Authorizes the District, upon State Education Department approval to lease property located at 623 Blooming Grove Turnpike in the town of New Windsor, county of Orange for the purpose of providing instruction to students enrolled in the school district. Section 2: Ratifies previous Board action regarding lease arrangements at these sites. Section 3: Establishes the effective date.
Title
Authorizes Greenburgh North Castle Union free school district to lease certain real property and establishes that the Greenburgh North Castle Union Free School District 12 and St. Christopher's Inc. are "private not-for-profit schools".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-15 | substituted by s7129b | |
2010-06-15 | rules report cal.149 | |
2010-06-15 | reported | |
2010-06-15 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-06-09 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-04-26 | print number 10272b | |
2010-04-26 | amend (t) and recommit to education | |
2010-04-15 | print number 10272a | |
2010-04-15 | amend and recommit to education | |
2010-03-16 | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S07129 (Same As) 2010-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.226
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10272&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |